VT H0358 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to technical corrections
Title
An act relating to technical corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed by Governor on April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 24, 2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2019-04-12 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-11 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-19 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2019-03-19 | House | Rep. Palasik of Milton reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-02-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |