VT H0394 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor on April 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor on April 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the disposition of the remains of veterans
Title
An act relating to the disposition of the remains of veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor on April 23, 2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 17, 2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 23, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-04-11 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2019-04-05 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-04-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-19 | House | Report of Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs agreed to. |
2019-03-19 | House | Rep. Troiano of Stannard reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2019-03-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-02-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |