VT H0439 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Home Weatherization Assistance Program
Title
An act relating to the Home Weatherization Assistance Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 117 (Y: 19 N: 117 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 122 (Y: 16 N: 122 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 74, Nays = 66 (Y: 74 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 38, Nays = 102 (Y: 38 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 81, Nays = 60 (Y: 81 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 90 (Y: 51 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 122 (Y: 16 N: 122 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 74, Nays = 66 (Y: 74 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 38, Nays = 102 (Y: 38 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 81, Nays = 60 (Y: 81 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 90 (Y: 51 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-03-27 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-03-27 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 117 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rep. Leffler of Enosburgh moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-27 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-03-27 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 122 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-27 | House | Amendment of Rep. Leffler of Enosburgh ruled not germane |
2019-03-27 | House | Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland raised a Point of Order |
2019-03-27 | House | Rep. Leffler of Enosburgh moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-27 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-03-27 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 74, Nays = 66 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rep. Graham of Williamstown moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-27 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-03-27 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 38, Nays = 102 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rep. Mattos of Milton moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-27 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-03-27 | House | Rep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs and Yacovone of Morristown moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-26 | House | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to. |
2019-03-26 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 81, Nays = 60 |
2019-03-26 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-03-26 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 90 |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Leffler of Enosburgh moved to commit the bill to the committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2019-03-26 | House | Amendment offered by Rep. Browning of Arlington in Sec. 1 and 2 ruled not germane |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. McCarthy of St. Albans City raised a Point of Order |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland asked that the question be divided |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Masland of Thetford reported for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-22 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Masland of Thetford |
2019-02-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means |