VT H0508 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Bennington
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Bennington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 4, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2019-05-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Government Operations intact, on motion of Senator White |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator White |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-05-14 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-14 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-14 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-14 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2019-05-14 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-14 | House | Rep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-14 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-05-14 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-02-28 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |