VT H0514 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous tax provisions
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous tax provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor on june 4, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2019-05-23 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2019-05-23 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Cummings for Committee, text |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2019-05-10 | House | Speaker appointed Young of Greensboro, Beck of St. Johnsbury and Masland of Thetford as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Cummings, Brock, and Campion |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Cummings |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-10 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-08 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Young of Greensboro |
2019-05-01 | House | Rep. Young of Greensboro moved to commit bill to the committee on Ways and Means which was agreed to. |
2019-04-26 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Pearson agreed to |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Pearson |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-04-23 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-03-19 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock asked leave to withdraw motion |
2019-03-19 | House | Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-15 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-15 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2019-03-15 | House | Rep. Young of Greensboro spoke for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-15 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-14 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Young of Greensboro |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 13, 2019 |