VT H0529 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Transportation Program and miscellaneous changes to laws related to transportation
Title
An act relating to the Transportation Program and miscellaneous changes to laws related to transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 14, 2019 |
2019-06-14 | House | Signed by Governor on June 14, 2019 |
2019-06-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 11, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2019-05-23 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2019-05-23 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Mazza for Committee, text |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Mazza, Ashe, and Perchlik |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2019-05-08 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-08 | House | Speaker appointed McCormack of Burlington, Corcoran of Bennington and Burke of Brattleboro as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. McCormack of Burlington |
2019-05-08 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-08 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senator Sears requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senator Sears moved to amend the proposal of amendment of Sen. Mazza et al by striking out Sec. 55 (scooters) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Mazza, Ashe, Kitchel, McNeil, and Perchlik motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White |
2019-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation, as amended, agreed to |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Mazza for Committee on Transportation |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2019-05-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-26 | House | Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Read Third time |
2019-03-26 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-26 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. McCormack of Burlington moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-22 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-22 | House | Rep. McCormack of Burlington moved to amend the bill which was agreed to |
2019-03-22 | House | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to. |
2019-03-22 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-22 | House | Rep. Helm of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | House | Rep. McCormack of Burlington spoke for the committee on Transportation |
2019-03-22 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Bill read first time |