VT H0536 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to education finance
Title
An act relating to education finance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 4, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by Governor on June 4, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 4, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2019-05-23 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Cummings for Committee, text |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2019-05-17 | House | Speaker appointed Ancel of Calais to replace Till of Jericho on the Committee of Conference |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Cummings, MacDonald, and Campion |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2019-05-14 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-14 | House | Speaker appointed Till of Jericho, Canfield of Fair Haven and Donovan of Burlington as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Ancel of Calais |
2019-05-14 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-13 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-03-27 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho spoke for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 22, 2018 |