VT H0543 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to capital construction and State bonding
Title
An act relating to capital construction and State bonding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | House | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2019-05-21 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-17 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-17 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-05-17 | House | Rep. Emmons of Springfield moved that the House concur in the Senate proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2019-05-16 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Emmons of Springfield |
2019-05-15 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Emmons of Springfield |
2019-05-14 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Emmons of Springfield |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sirotkin motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senator(s) Starr motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions, as amended, agreed to |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Institutions |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2019-05-09 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions |
2019-04-02 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-29 | House | Report of Committee on Appropriations agreed to. |
2019-03-29 | House | Rep. Fagan of Rutland City recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-29 | House | Rep. Emmons of Springfield spoke for the committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2019-03-29 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee Bill read first time |