VT H0571 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-12 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-12 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to creating the Department of Liquor and Lottery and the Board of Liquor and Lottery
Title
An act relating to creating the Department of Liquor and Lottery and the Board of Liquor and Lottery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-12 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 5 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-12 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 5 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Consideration of bill interrupted by recess, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator McCormack for Committee, text |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators McCormack, Clarkson, and Ashe |
2018-05-10 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2018-05-09 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-09 | House | Speaker appointed Stevens of Waterbury, Walz of Barre City and Gonzalez of Winooski as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Stevens of Waterbury |
2018-05-09 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Clarkson motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-04 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-02-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-02-21 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-02-21 | House | Rep. LaClair of Barre Town moved to amend the bill |
2018-02-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-20 | House | Report of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs as amended agreed to |
2018-02-20 | House | Report of the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | House | Rep. Trieber of Rockingham recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2018-02-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-15 | House | Rep. Head of South Burlington moved to postpone action until February 20, 2018 which was agreed to |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-01-05 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |