VT H0960 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Signed by Governor on July 6, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to miscellaneous health care provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to miscellaneous health care provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06HouseSigned by Governor on July 6, 2020
2020-06-30HouseDelivered to the Governor on June 30, 2020
2020-06-26SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2020-06-26HouseRules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney.
2020-06-26HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2020-06-26HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-26HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-06-25SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2020-06-25SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-06-25SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint
2020-06-25Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-06-25SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
2020-06-25SenateReported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-25SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-06-25SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
2020-06-25SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-25SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-06-25SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-06-24SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2020-06-24SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-06-24SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-06-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-06-09HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-09HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-06-05HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-06-05HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield agreed to
2020-06-05HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield spoke for the committee on Health Care
2020-06-05HouseRead Second Time
2020-06-01HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on June 1, 2020

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback