VT JRS017 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution providing for a Joint Assembly to vote on the retention of eight Superior Judges and one Magistrate
Title
Joint resolution providing for a Joint Assembly to vote on the retention of eight Superior Judges and one Magistrate
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Nitka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-03-21 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2019-03-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-03-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-03-21 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-03-20 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-03-19 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-03-15 | House | Adopted in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-03-15 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Rachelson of Burlington agreed to |
2019-03-14 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Adopted on the part of the Senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |