VT JRS048 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-30 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-30 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution authorizing the Commissioner of Forests, Parks and Recreation to amend the Department’s lease with the Stowe Mountain Resort and to amend a conservation easement in the Town of Plymouth
Title
Joint resolution authorizing the Commissioner of Forests, Parks and Recreation to amend the Department’s lease with the Stowe Mountain Resort and to amend a conservation easement in the Town of Plymouth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2018-03-30 | Senate | House message House adopted in concurrence |
2018-03-28 | House | Passed in concurrence |
2018-03-28 | House | Read Third time |
2018-03-27 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-27 | House | Rep. Macaig of Williston reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2018-03-27 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-27 | House | Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & adopted |
2018-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on Notice Calendar per Rule 34 |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2018/J.R.S.48 |
Text | http://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/ACTS/ACTR337/ACTR337%20As%20Adopted.pdf |