VT S0007 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to social service integration with Vermont's health care system
Title
An act relating to social service integration with Vermont's health care system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 5, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Lyons, Cummings, Ingram, McCormack, and Westman |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senator Lyons, Cummings, Ingram, McCormack, and Westman moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons, Cummings, Ingram, McCormack, and Westman |
2019-05-22 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-17 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-16 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care as amended agreed to |
2019-05-16 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care amended as offered by Committee on Human Services |
2019-05-16 | House | Rep. Wood of Waterbury reported for the committee on Human Services |
2019-05-16 | House | Rep. Cordes of Lincoln reported for the committee on Health Care |
2019-05-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-05-07 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to. |
2019-03-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as moved by Senator Lyons |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Lyons, text |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |