VT S0014 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor on April 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor on April 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to extending the moratorium on home health agency certificates of need
Title
An act relating to extending the moratorium on home health agency certificates of need
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor on April 19, 2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 15, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-04-03 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2019-03-29 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-28 | House | Rep. Nicoll of Ludlow reported for the committee on Human Services |
2019-03-28 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-27 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Nicoll of Ludlow |
2019-02-06 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Westman for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-01-31 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |