VT S0016 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to expanding patient access to the Medical Marijuana Registry
Title
An act relating to expanding patient access to the Medical Marijuana Registry
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Sears [D] | Sen. Timothy Ashe [D] | Sen. Joseph Benning [R] | Sen. Brian Campion [D] |
Sen. Dustin Degree [R] | Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Jeanette White [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 130, Nays = 16 (Y: 130 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 6/8/17 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on 6/2/17 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2017-05-10 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sears for Committee, text |
2017-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2017-05-05 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2017-05-05 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-05-04 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-03 | House | Speaker appointed Pugh of South Burlington, Haas of Rochester and McFaun of Barre Town as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Sears |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Sears, Benning, and White |
2017-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sears |
2017-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears |
2017-05-03 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-02 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-02 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 130, Nays = 16 |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-05-02 | House | Read Third time |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. McCormack of Burlington asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. McCormack of Burlington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-05-02 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Haas of Rochester moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-05-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-05-01 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rep. Haas of Rochester reported for the committee on Human Services |
2017-05-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-02-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary with recommendation of amendment |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |