VT S0018 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate message, Allowed to become law without Governor's signature June 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate message, Allowed to become law without Governor's signature June 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to consumer justice enforcement
Title
An act relating to consumer justice enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Pearson, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate message, Allowed to become law without Governor's signature June 19, 2019 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Allowed to become law without signature of Governor on June 19, 2019 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 13, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-23 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Pearson, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator White for Committee, text |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2019-05-14 | House | Speaker appointed LaLonde of South Burlington, Colburn of Burlington and Burditt of West Rutland as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-13 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators White, Baruth, and Benning |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sears |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-10 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-09 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-09 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2019-05-09 | House | Rep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-09 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |