VT S0031 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to informed health care financial decision making and the consent policy for the Vermont Health Information Exchange
Title
An act relating to informed health care financial decision making and the consent policy for the Vermont Health Information Exchange
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 5, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-21 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-20 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment |
2019-05-16 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Jickling of Randolph |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Lyons |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Lyons; text |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons |
2019-05-14 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-07 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-07 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rep. Smith of Derby reported for the committee on Health Care |
2019-05-07 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Benning |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Benning |
2019-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |