VT S0041 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10,2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10,2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to regulating entities that administer tax-advantaged accounts for health-related expenses
Title
An act relating to regulating entities that administer tax-advantaged accounts for health-related expenses
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Bray [D] | Sen. Rebecca Balint [D] | Sen. Philip Baruth [D] | Sen. Joseph Benning [R] |
Sen. Brian Campion [D] | Sen. Deborah Ingram [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10,2019 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 4, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-15 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-15 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-13 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-13 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-10 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-10 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to. |
2019-05-10 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-10 | House | Rep. Durfee of Shaftsbury reported for the committee on Health Care |
2019-05-10 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-05-10 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg |
2019-04-19 | House | Rep Lippert of Hinesburg moved to recommit the bill to the Committee on Health Care which was agreed to |
2019-04-19 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-03-19 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-13 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |