VT S0049 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 15, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 15, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the regulation of polyfluoroalkyl substances in drinking and surface waters
Title
An act relating to the regulation of polyfluoroalkyl substances in drinking and surface waters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 135, Nays = 1 (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 9, 2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-04-26 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-04-26 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-04-26 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-19 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-19 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-04-17 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-04-16 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 135, Nays = 1 |
2019-04-16 | House | Proposal of amendment of the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife agreed to |
2019-04-16 | House | Rep. Squirrell of Underhill reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2019-04-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-15 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-03-12 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |