VT S0053 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 6, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 6, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to determining the proportion of health care spending allocated to primary care
Title
An act relating to determining the proportion of health care spending allocated to primary care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 6, 2019 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 6, 2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 30.2019 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-04-19 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2019-04-17 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-04-16 | House | Rep. Christensen of Weathersfield reported for the committee on Health Care |
2019-04-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |