VT S0055 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the regulation of toxic substances and hazardous materials
Title
An act relating to the regulation of toxic substances and hazardous materials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 4 (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 5 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 5 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 19, 2019 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 13, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-22 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-17 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-16 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 4 |
2019-05-16 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to. |
2019-05-16 | House | Rep. Haas of Rochester reported for the committee on Human Services |
2019-05-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 5 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Bray, text |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |