VT S0058 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the State hemp program
Title
An act relating to the State hemp program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-14 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-14 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-10 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-09 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry as amended agreed to |
2019-05-09 | House | Report of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-09 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-09 | House | Rep. Young of Greensboro recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-09 | House | Rep. O'Brien of Tunbridge reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2019-05-09 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-03-29 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture, as amended, agreed to |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Agriculture |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2019-03-26 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |