VT S0059 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the creation of the Sports Betting Study Committee
Title
An act relating to the creation of the Sports Betting Study Committee
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Sirotkin [D] | Sen. Rebecca Balint [D] | Sen. Brian Campion [D] | Sen. Brian Collamore [R] |
Sen. Christopher Pearson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Hardy and Ingram |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-06-16 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-06-12 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2020-06-12 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |