VT S0068 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 6, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 6, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to Indigenous Peoples’ Day
Title
An act relating to Indigenous Peoples’ Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 42, Nays = 95 (Y: 42 N: 95 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 113, Nays = 24 (Y: 113 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 113, Nays = 24 (Y: 113 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 6, 2019 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 6, 2019 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 3, 2019 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-04-19 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2019-04-17 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2019-04-17 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-04-17 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 42, Nays = 95 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rep. Batchelor of Derby and Gamache of Swanton moved that the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-04-16 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 113, Nays = 24 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rep. Killacky of South Burlington reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2019-04-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |