VT S0073 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to licensure of ambulatory surgical centers
Title
An act relating to licensure of ambulatory surgical centers
Sponsors
Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Ann Cummings [D] | Sen. Deborah Ingram [D] | Sen. Richard McCormack [D] |
Sen. Richard Westman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 4, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-23 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Lyons for Committee, text |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Lyons, Westman, and Ingram |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-22 | House | Speaker appointed Lippert of Hinesburg, Houghton of Essex and Donahue of Northfield as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg |
2019-05-22 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-05-22 | House | Rep. Young of Greensboro raised a Point of Order |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Lyons |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment |
2019-05-16 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senator Lyons moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons |
2019-05-14 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-07 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-07 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care as amended agreed to |
2019-05-07 | House | Report of the Committee on Health Care amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-07 | House | Rep. Ancel of Calais recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-07 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield reported for the committee on Health Care |
2019-05-07 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-03-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Brock |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Brock |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Brock |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Westman for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |