VT S0095 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to municipal utility capital investment
Title
An act relating to municipal utility capital investment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 20, 2019 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 20, 2019 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 17, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-21 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator MacDonald for Committee, text |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-20 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2019-05-16 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2019-05-08 | House | Speaker appointed Sibilia of Dover, Briglin of Thetford and Yantachka of Charlotte as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators MacDonald, Pearson, and Balint |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Cummings |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-04-25 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-04-24 | House | Proposal of amendment of the Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to |
2019-04-24 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-04-24 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-04-24 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover reported for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-04-24 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-15 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Brock for Committee on Finance |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-12 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |