VT S0105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous judiciary procedures
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous judiciary procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 19, 2019 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 13, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-21 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-20 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-16 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-16 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-16 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-16 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to |
2019-05-16 | House | Report of the Committee on Judiciary amended as offered by Rep. Burditt of West Rutland |
2019-05-16 | House | Report of the Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-16 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-16 | House | Rep. Grad of Moretown reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2019-03-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |