VT S0106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to establishing the Municipal Self-Governance Program
Title
An act relating to establishing the Municipal Self-Governance Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Passed on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 8 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 8 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Motion disagreed to |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sirotkin moved to amend bill |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Rodgers |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth and Hardy |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth and Hardy |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation of Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) White, Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pollina, text |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White, Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pollina |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |