VT S0112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to earned good time
Title
An act relating to earned good time
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 5, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senator Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White |
2019-05-14 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-08 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2019-05-08 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill |
2019-05-07 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-07 | House | Report of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rep. Shaw of Pittsford reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2019-05-07 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |