VT S0294 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 4 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to expanding access to expungement and sealing of criminal history records

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to expanding access to expungement and sealing of criminal history records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Judiciary
2020-06-04SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-06-04SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2020-06-04SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-06-03Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-06-03SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
2020-06-03SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-03SenateReported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2020-06-03SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2020-06-03SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-03SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2020-06-03SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-06-02SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-02SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2020-06-02SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-05-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-05-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2020-05-29SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-03-24SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2020-03-24SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-24SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-14SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback