WA HB1002 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the offense of rape in the third degree.
Title
Modifying the offense of rape in the third degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-24 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2018-12-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |