WA HB1008 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Studying the constitutional and statutory obligations and tax revenue capacity of local government entities.
Title
Studying the constitutional and statutory obligations and tax revenue capacity of local government entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-23 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2018-12-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |