WA HB1010 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the disposition of forfeited firearms by the Washington state patrol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the disposition of forfeited firearms by the Washington state patrol.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2020-02-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-20SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-20SenateLAW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:00 AM.
2020-01-27SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2020-01-23HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-01-23HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-01-23House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-01-21HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-02-15HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-01-18HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-18HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2018-12-05HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback