WA HB1011 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding proximity to working forests to the residential real estate disclosure statement.
Title
Adding proximity to working forests to the residential real estate disclosure statement.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-08 | House | Chapter 17, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | FIET - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-16 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2018-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |