WA HB1023 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extending apprenticeship utilization requirements.
Title
Extending apprenticeship utilization requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-13 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-13 | House | LWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-13 | House | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development. |
2013-12-18 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5393 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.