WA HB1046 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 3 Consideration.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 3 Consideration.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certificates of academic and individual achievement.
Title
Concerning certificates of academic and individual achievement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules 3 Consideration. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 2:30 PM. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-21 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Education. |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2016-12-22 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |