WA HB1070 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the tax treatment of renewable natural gas.
Title
Concerning the tax treatment of renewable natural gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-30 | House | Chapter 202, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-21 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2019-01-24 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2018-12-31 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5108 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.