WA HB1083 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing greater certainty in association with selling city-owned property used for off-street parking.
Title
Providing greater certainty in association with selling city-owned property used for off-street parking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 254, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 85; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 1; excused, 1. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-30 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |