WA HB1088 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning repercussions for littering.
Title
Concerning repercussions for littering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-31 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |