WA HB1092 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the compensation of commissioners of certain metropolitan park districts.
Title
Concerning the compensation of commissioners of certain metropolitan park districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | House | Chapter 198, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-30 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5036 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.