WA HB1100 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Evaluating competency to stand trial.
Title
Evaluating competency to stand trial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | BH - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-25 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |