WA HB1103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning smoke detection devices.
Title
Concerning smoke detection devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5284 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1103&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1103.pdf |