WA HB1106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating use of detention for violation of a truancy-related court order while providing more opportunities for truant youth to access services and treatment.
Title
Eliminating use of detention for violation of a truancy-related court order while providing more opportunities for truant youth to access services and treatment.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |