WA HB1109 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring institutions of higher education that offer an early course registration period to provide early registration for eligible veterans and national guard members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring institutions of higher education that offer an early course registration period to provide early registration for eligible veterans and national guard members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-25HouseEffective date 7/28/2013.
2013-04-25HouseChapter 67, 2013 Laws.
2013-04-25HouseGovernor signed.
2013-04-19HouseDelivered to Governor.
2013-04-16SenatePresident signed.
2013-04-16HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-04-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2013-04-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-04-02SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2013-03-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-03-27SenateHIE - Majority; do pass.
2013-03-26SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
2013-03-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education.
2013-03-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2013-03-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-03-01HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2013-02-22HouseMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2013-02-15HousePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-02-12HouseHE - Majority; do pass.
2013-02-12HouseHE - Executive action taken by committee.
2013-02-12HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
2013-02-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
2013-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
2013-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Higher Education.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback