WA HB1109 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing membership in the teachers' retirement system for certificated employees of the superintendent of public instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing membership in the teachers' retirement system for certificated employees of the superintendent of public instruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-01-11HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2016-01-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2016-01-11HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-24SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2015-03-04SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2015-03-02HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2015-03-02HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2015-03-02House1st substitute bill substituted
2015-02-12HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2015-02-10HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2015-02-05HouseMinority; do not pass.
2015-02-05HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2015-02-05HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2015-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations
2015-01-09HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback