WA HB1109 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting victims of sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting victims of sexual assault.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16HouseEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-05-16HouseChapter 290, 2017 Laws.
2017-05-16HouseGovernor signed.
2017-04-23HouseDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-21SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-21HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-20HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2017-04-20HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2017-04-20SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-04-20SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-04-20SenateFloor amendment
2017-04-20SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2017-04-20SenateRules suspended.
2017-04-20SenateSenate receded from amendments.
2017-04-20HouseHouse insists on its position and asks Senate to concur.
2017-04-19SenateSenate insists on its position and asks House to concur.
2017-04-17HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
2017-04-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-04-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-04-11SenateCommittee amendment
2017-04-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-04-04SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-04-04SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-04-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2017-04-03SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2017-03-29SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2017-03-29SenateLAW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2017-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-06HouseFloor amendment
2017-03-06House1st substitute bill substituted
2017-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-23HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-23HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-22HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-01-19HousePS - Majority; do pass.
2017-01-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1109&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1109.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1109-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1109-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1109-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1109-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1109&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1109&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-11-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1109&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-20-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1109&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-20-2017

Bill Comments

feedback