WA HB1110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the greenhouse gas emissions associated with transportation fuels.
Title
Reducing the greenhouse gas emissions associated with transportation fuels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | And refer to Transportation. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at time TBA. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | And refer to Transportation. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-03-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-12 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-14 | House | TR - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment & Energy. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-01-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-24 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5412 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-16 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.