WA HB1112 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning standards for the use of science to support public policy.
Title
Concerning standards for the use of science to support public policy.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. David Upthegrove [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. David Taylor [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. James Wilcox [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-04-25 | House | Chapter 68, 2013 Laws. |
2013-04-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-19 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
2013-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-12 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-12 | House | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |