WA HB1112 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Public Safety.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Vacating convictions arising from offenses committed as a result of being a victim of trafficking, promoting prostitution, or promoting commercial sexual abuse of a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacating convictions arising from offenses committed as a result of being a victim of trafficking, promoting prostitution, or promoting commercial sexual abuse of a minor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Public Safety.
2018-01-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-02HousePS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety

Same As/Similar To

SB5272 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-25 - Effective date 7/23/2017.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback