WA HB1120 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the term essential academic learning requirements to state learning standards to reflect current terminology.
Title
Updating the term essential academic learning requirements to state learning standards to reflect current terminology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-31 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2019-01-11 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5068 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.